MA H273 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4454
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to membership fees at health clubs for certain physically or medically disabled persons. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to fees at health clubs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4454 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H597 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
S1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4257 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H4454 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H597 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
S1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4257 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H4454 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H273 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H273.pdf |