MA H2718 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4960

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the allowable earnings for individuals pensioned or retired for disability. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding post-disability retirement earnings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4960
2021-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2608 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2606 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4960 (Replaced by) 2022-07-05 - Reported, in part, by H2611

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback