MA H2708 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating group insurance benefits for state employees and retired state employees. Public Service.
Title
Further regulating group insurance benefits for state employees and retired state employees
Sponsors
Rep. John Lawn [D] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1676 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2708 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2708.pdf |