MA H2705 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to payments in lieu of vacation as regular compensation for certain retirees and active retirement system members. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To preserve the practice of including annual payments in lieu of vacation as regular compensation for current retirees and active retirement system members where such benefit existed as of May 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1721 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2727 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2579 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2580 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1693 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1736 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback