MA H2686 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the promulgation of State Building Code regulations to allow for gender neutral bathrooms. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing gender neutral bathrooms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1901 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S867 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2145 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3728 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S867 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2145 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3728 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2686 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2686.pdf |