MA H2667 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide public safety telecommunicators with the same internal benefits as first responders. Public Service.
Title
To provide public safety telecommunicators with the same internal benefits as first responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2667 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2667.pdf |