MA H2666 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to taxes generated by charitable raffles and bazaars. Revenue.
Title
To reduce taxes generated by charitable raffles and bazaars
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Leah Cole [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] |
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2666 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2666.pdf |