MA H2642 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to disability pensions for violent crimes committed against certain public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability pensions for violent crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1722 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2697 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
H2697 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2642 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2642.pdf |