MA H2636 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
That the state Board of Retirement grant creditable service to Thomas Famulari
Title
That the state Board of Retirement grant creditable service to Thomas Famulari
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 30, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 11/16 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h02636.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht02/ht02636.htm |