MA H2618 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize employees of the South Shore Charter School to join the state employees retirement system. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the South Shore Charter School to join the State Employees Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2800 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
S1732 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2550 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4592
S1724 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1681 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2748
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1732 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2550 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4592
S1724 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1681 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2748
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2618.pdf |