MA H261 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent the automatic signing up of consumers for products or services. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To prohibit negative option sales and disclosure of financial and personal information without a consumer’s express agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H996 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1092 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S692 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2774 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1092 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S692 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2774 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H261 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H261.pdf |