MA H1092 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide information to consumers in the issuance of automobile insurance policies and bonds. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect consumers in the issuance of automobile insurance policies and bonds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1094 (Similar To) 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H962 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H996 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
H948 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S561 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H261 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback