MA H2607 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to single sales factor in the calculation of taxes for certain financial institutions. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to single sales factor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H1123 (Similar To) 2019-08-27 - Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H2595 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2601 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2559 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2560 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S1765 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1702 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1703 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H934 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1
H4244 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback