MA H934 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require financial institutions to pay late fees upon failure to conduct electronic transfers. Financial Services.
Title
To require financial institutions to pay late fees when it fails to conduct an electronic transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1123 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2607 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S642 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1067 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2310
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2607 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S642 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1067 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2310
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H934 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H934.pdf |