MA H26 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Joint session held and recessed to Thursday, November 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Joint session held and recessed to Thursday, November 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to voting rights of certain persons incarcerated in correctional facilities due to felony convictions. Election Laws.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to voting rights
Sponsors
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
Rep. Samantha Montano [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Thursday, November 14, 2024 |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, April 10, 2024 |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 11, 2023 |
2023-05-08 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file |
2023-03-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3899 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4114 (Similar To) 2023-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4552 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
H4114 (Similar To) 2023-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4552 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H26 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H26.pdf |