MA H2592 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4437

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the sales tax imposed on the purchase of certain motor vehicles and bicycles. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revising sales taxes on motor vehicles and bicycles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4437
2013-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4437 (Replaced by) 2014-11-13 - Reported, in part, by H3537

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback