MA H2581 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to charges associated with condominiums in tax title. Revenue.
Title
Relative to charges associated with condominiums in tax title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H705 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
H578 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H896 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H897 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1438 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H705 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
H578 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H896 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H897 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1438 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2581 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2581.pdf |