MA H705 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reinstate the clean environment fund to reduce waste and protect the environment in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To reinstate the clean environment fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4167 |
2015-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Westport Grange |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4167 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H578 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H896 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H897 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1438 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1850 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H578 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H896 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H897 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1438 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1850 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H705 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H705.pdf |