MA H2580 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4518

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to pensions for children of public safety officers killed in the line of duty. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pensions for children of public safety officers killed in the line of duty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4518
2023-10-12JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2641 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H2541 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S1628 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback