MA H2578 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating group insurance benefits for state employees and retired state employees. Public Service.
Title
Further regulating group insurance benefits for state employees and retired state employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2578 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2578.pdf |