MA H2571 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lancaster be authorized to exempt the position of police chief in said town from the provisions of the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the position of police chief in the town of Lancaster from the provisions of the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-01-02 | House | Enacted |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-17 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-07-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3731 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3877 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3999 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3877 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3999 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2571 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2571.pdf |