MA H2546 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the executive director of the Municipal Police Training Committee from earnings limitations. Public Service.
Title
To exempt the Executive Director of the Municipal Police Training Committee from earnings limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1646 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2546.pdf |