MA H2536 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4466
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a family caregiver tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Establishing the family caregiver tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4466 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2459 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2612 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1691 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2551
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
H4466 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2459 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2612 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1691 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2551
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
H4466 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2536 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2536.pdf |