MA H253 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale of children’s jewelry. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the sale of children’s jewelry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-08-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-02-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H253 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H253.pdf |