MA H2525 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Smola of Warren, a petition of Todd M. Smola that the Executive Office of Public Safety be directed to create a blue alert system, so-called, for the apprehension of individuals wanted for seriously injuring or killing law enforcement officials. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to implementing a blue alert system in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2464 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2525 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2525.pdf |