MA H2513 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creditable service for certain local and state police officers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the creditable service for local municipal police and the Massachusetts State Police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1438 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H18 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1438 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H18 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2513 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2513.pdf |