MA H2493 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the retirement rights of certain employees of Plymouth County. Public Service.
Title
Further regulating the retirement rights of certain employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-07-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1614 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S1316 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S1708 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1316 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S1708 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2493 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2493.pdf |