MA H2484 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote rehabilitation including guaranteed health, treatment and safety for incarcerated LGBTQI+ persons. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To promote rehabilitation including guaranteed health, treatment, and safety for incarcerated LGBTQI+ people
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-06 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1566 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2378 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2378 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2484.pdf |