MA H2478 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement benefits for compliance officers at the Department of Fire Services. Public Service.
Title
Relative to compliance officers at the Department of Fire Services
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3891 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4463 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4463 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2478.pdf |