MA H2463 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5128

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 103-15)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to community preservation revenue. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To preserve community preservation revenue

Sponsors

Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]
Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5128
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback