MA H2449 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to non-membership service in public safety for certain uniformed members of paid fire or police departments. Public Service.
Title
Relative to non-membership service in public safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4518 |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2435 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S2720
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
S2720 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4546 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
S2720 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4546 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2449 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2449.pdf |