MA H2430 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include psychologists in the definition of nursing practice. Public Health.
Title
Relative to facilitating the utilization of psychologists on the health care team
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-23 | House | Accompanied by S1179 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1179 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2430
S1204 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1204 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2430 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2430.pdf |