MA H2419 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4758
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4758
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4758
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Architectural Access Board and the removal of certain barriers that discriminate against persons with disabilities, mobility impairments and seniors. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Removing barriers to work that discriminate against persons with disabilities, mobility impairments, and seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4758 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1629 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4758 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4758 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2419.pdf |