MA H2419 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to providing smoking cessation programs for certain police officers and fire fighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to firefighters cessation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2419 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2419.pdf |