MA H2397 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a task force (including members of the General Court) and pilot program to examine the impact of obesity in the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
Creating an obesity task force and pilot program
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2022-06-06 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
S125 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3363 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1350 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
H3692 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1499 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S277 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S1816 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2828
S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
S2340 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1436 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2894
S119 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1165 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S864 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S125 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3363 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1350 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
H3692 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1499 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S277 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S1816 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2828
S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
S2340 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1436 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2894
S119 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1165 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S864 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2397 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2397.pdf |