MA H2350 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate PFAS chemicals in consumer products. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricting toxic PFAS chemicals in consumer products to protect our health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-17SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-17HouseReporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-06-09JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H341 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S166
H690 (Similar To) 2021-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H159 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2244 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2354 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied S1445
S1459 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1481 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S528 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S624 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S623 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback