MA H2346 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the veteran allowance under the public employee retirement law. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the veteran allowance for public retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-24 | House | Accompanied by S1503 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2346 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2346.pdf |