MA H234 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the transfer of innholder liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Concerning the transferal of innholders' licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4736 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H234 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H234.pdf |