MA H2323 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a special commission (including members of the General Court) to examine the advisability of the Commonwealth joining the Nurse Licensure Compact and or the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact. Public Health.
Title
Creating a commission to consider the Commonwealth's involvement in licensure compacts
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5198 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2091 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H978 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S379 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1497 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5198 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3604 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H847 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2091 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H978 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S379 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1497 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5198 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3604 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2323 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2323.pdf |