MA H232 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to fines for alcoholic beverage license violations. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fines for license violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-03-24HouseRules suspended
2016-03-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-03-16HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-11-12JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H4736 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback