MA H2305 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the deposit of certain fines into the Victims of Human Trafficking Trust Fund. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the Human Trafficking Trust Fund (HTTF)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1792 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1323 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S918 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1614 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
S850 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3215 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1116 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H844 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1861 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1909 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3893 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H782 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1323 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S918 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1614 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
S850 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3215 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1116 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H844 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1861 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1909 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3893 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H782 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2305.pdf |