MA H2303 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Holliston to establish an other post-employment benefits trust fund By Representative Dykema of Holliston and Senator Spilka, a joint petition of Carolyn C. Dykema and Karen E. Spilka (by vote of the town) that the town of Holliston be authorized to establish an other post-employment benefits fund. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Holliston to establish an other post-employment benefits trust fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-12-23 | House | Enacted |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-11-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-11-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-09-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2303 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2303.pdf |