MA H2300 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to state funded counsel during sex offender classification hearings. The Judiciary.
Title
Removing state funded counsel from sex offender classification hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S583 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2267 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S583 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2267 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2300.pdf |