MA H2289 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S835

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to criminalizing sexual assault by fraud by a medical professional. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminalizing sexual assault by fraud by a medical professional

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-03-19HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2018-02-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-02-15HouseAccompanied by S835
2017-11-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H776 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H777 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S835 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H2289

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback