MA H2271 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for hazing by secondary or post secondary students residing in residential schools designated as handicapped housing. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to school hazing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2271.pdf |