MA H2241 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4812
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4812
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4812
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of the term physician. Public Health.
Title
Relative to health care transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4812 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H385 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S740 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1508 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2051 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1211 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1306 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H4812 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S740 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1508 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2051 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1211 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1306 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H4812 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2241 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2241.pdf |