MA H2196 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to registered nurse patient assignment. Public Health.
Title
Promoting patient safety and equitable access to care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2196 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2196.pdf |