MA H2194 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to homeowners insurance rate filings that include charges for expected hurricane losses or catastrophes. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts homeowners’ insurance rate filings
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] |
Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2967 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S562 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H534 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S574 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2977 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S562 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H534 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S574 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2977 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2194 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2194.pdf |