MA H2182 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health insurance coverage for substance abuse services provided by certified addiction recovery coaches. Financial Services.
Title
To ensure access to recovery coaches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1074 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H526 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied S502
H545 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H572 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1408 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H581 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H526 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied S502
H545 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H572 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1408 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H581 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2182 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2182.pdf |