MA H2161 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4432
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize non-profit or charitable organizations to apply for waivers to the elevator inspection fees. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to Elevator Inspection Fees
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] |
Rep. Martha Walz [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Thomas Conroy [D] | Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4432 |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4432 (Replaced by) 2014-08-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2161 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2161.pdf |